TN SB2422 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires landlords in the City of Hendersonville, upon adoption by a two-thirds vote of the legislative body, to register with the department of the city that enforces building codes. - Amends TCA Section 66-28-107.
Title
As introduced, requires landlords in the City of Hendersonville, upon adoption by a two-thirds vote of the legislative body, to register with the department of the city that enforces building codes. - Amends TCA Section 66-28-107.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2509 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee