TN SB2417 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the comptroller of the treasury to conduct comprehensive audits of prison contractors, with such audits to include the review of all contracts and the overall performance of contractors. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 8, Chapter 4 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires the comptroller of the treasury to conduct comprehensive audits of prison contractors, with such audits to include the review of all contracts and the overall performance of contractors. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 8, Chapter 4 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2428 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.