TN SB2417 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the use of green infrastructure practices within areas that have combined sanitary sewage and storm water systems. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the use of green infrastructure practices within areas that have combined sanitary sewage and storm water systems. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26 Pub. Ch. 792
2016-04-26 Effective date(s) 04/12/2016
2016-04-12SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-04-01SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-03-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-03-30SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-03-29SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-03-28HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-03-28HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-03-17HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-03-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-03-14SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2016-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/14/2016
2016-03-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2016-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1850 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback