TN SB2417 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Subst. for comp. HB.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Subst. for comp. HB.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the sales tax on food and food ingredients for human consumption from 5.5 percent to 5 percent. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, reduces the sales tax on food and food ingredients for human consumption from 5.5 percent to 5 percent. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2555 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2417&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2417.pdf |