TN SB2417 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, codifies the acts of the 2009 legislative session.
Title
As enacted, codifies the acts of the 2009 legislative session.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Pub. Ch. 624 | |
2010-03-11 | Effective date(s) 03/03/10 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-02-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-02-18 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-02-18 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2010-02-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-02-11 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-02-08 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/08/2010 | |
2010-02-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/02/2010 | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2570 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624