TN SB2415 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a winery or farm wine producer to conduct business at satellite locations; requires all payments to wholesalers by licensees be made by electronic funds transfer, credit card, debit card, or such other method that will facilitate full payment at or near the time of delivery; revises other various provisions governing alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a winery or farm wine producer to conduct business at satellite locations; requires all payments to wholesalers by licensees be made by electronic funds transfer, credit card, debit card, or such other method that will facilitate full payment at or near the time of delivery; revises other various provisions governing alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 4 (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 1015 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/24/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Returned by Governor without signature. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #4 |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #3 |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #2 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 13, PNV 8 |
2014-04-14 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - HA1251) |
2014-04-14 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1223) |
2014-04-14 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1196) |
2014-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0709) |
2014-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 8 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0789) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2027 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1015