TN SB2412 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from no more than 12 hours to no more than eight hours, the time within which a chief officer of a residential mental health service facility must notify the medical examiner after discovery of a facility resident's death. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 39; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 39; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to residential care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2162 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee