TN SB2411 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state board of education to develop standards, and the department of education to develop an aligned curriculum, for instruction on healthy relationships in the lifetime wellness standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, requires the state board of education to develop standards, and the department of education to develop an aligned curriculum, for instruction on healthy relationships in the lifetime wellness standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2527 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee