TN SB2410 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes an institute of American civics at the University of Tennessee, Knoxville; requires the president of the University of Tennessee, in consultation with the governor, the speaker of the senate, and the speaker of the house of representatives, to appoint 13 members to serve on a board of fellows for the institute; establishes procedure for appointment of a director for the institute. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9, relative to civics.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2022 | |
2022-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 963 | |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2022-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0801) |
2022-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 3 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0814) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2157 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 963