TN SB2410 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a privilege tax in amount of $10.00 per metric ton on carbon dioxide emissions in excess of 500,000 metric tons produced from burning natural gas and coal to produce electricity for delivery in this state; establishes a formula for calculating emissions; provides for administration of the tax. - Amends TCA Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 201.
Title
As introduced, imposes a privilege tax in amount of $10.00 per metric ton on carbon dioxide emissions in excess of 500,000 metric tons produced from burning natural gas and coal to produce electricity for delivery in this state; establishes a formula for calculating emissions; provides for administration of the tax. - Amends TCA Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 201.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2593 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee