TN SB2395 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 864
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 864
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits law enforcement officers of this state and its political subdivisions from enforcing provisions of international law and treaties that limit gun rights under Article I, Section 26 of the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, prohibits law enforcement officers of this state and its political subdivisions from enforcing provisions of international law and treaties that limit gun rights under Article I, Section 26 of the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 864 | |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Judiciary Committee 3/29/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2389 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 864