TN SB2391 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, abolishes annexation by ordinance at the initiative of the municipality unless authorized countywide by the county legislative body for the remainder of the twenty-year comprehensive growth plan ratified and approved immediately following enactment of Chapter 1101 of the Public Acts of 1998. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58.
Title
As introduced, abolishes annexation by ordinance at the initiative of the municipality unless authorized countywide by the county legislative body for the remainder of the twenty-year comprehensive growth plan ratified and approved immediately following enactment of Chapter 1101 of the Public Acts of 1998. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2026 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-20 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2391&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2391.pdf |