TN SB2389 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires use of certain definitions of anti-Semitism and provides examples of anti-Semitism to be used in determinations of violations of K-12 or postsecondary educational policies prohibiting discrimination based on Jewish ancestry or ethnic characteristics. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires use of certain definitions of anti-Semitism and provides examples of anti-Semitism to be used in determinations of violations of K-12 or postsecondary educational policies prohibiting discrimination based on Jewish ancestry or ethnic characteristics. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2357 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Failed for lack of second in: Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee