TN SB2388 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Re-refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Re-refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, affords municipal law enforcement agency 30 days, instead of 20 days, from receipt of notice suspending municipality's authorization to enforce rules of the road, to provide proof to department of safety that agency was in compliance with rules of the department. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As introduced, affords municipal law enforcement agency 30 days, instead of 20 days, from receipt of notice suspending municipality's authorization to enforce rules of the road, to provide proof to department of safety that agency was in compliance with rules of the department. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Comm. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/2/18 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2319 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-12 - Held on desk.