TN SB2387 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau to implement an electronic system that permits nursing facility providers to track the status of medicare crossover claims; establishes a process for a nursing facility to appeal the denial of such claim. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68 and Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to crossover claims.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2302 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee