TN SB2383 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1051
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1051
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes terminology from "medication aides certified" to "medication aide"; revises training and other requirements for medication aide program. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, changes terminology from "medication aides certified" to "medication aide"; revises training and other requirements for medication aide program. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 4 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 1051 | |
2016-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2016; 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA0996) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 4 - HA1177) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Tabling motion lifted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 4 - HA1177) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA0996) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 15, PNV 2 |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0996) |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA1177) |
2016-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0995) |
2016-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0994) |
2016-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0832) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0675) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0676) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2013 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1051