TN SB2382 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the public utility commission to report to the general assembly concerning the status of the functioning of universal service mechanisms on or before March 1, 2023, and on or before March 1 thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 47 and Title 65, relative to telecommunications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2480 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.