TN SB2377 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 847
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, designates The Church @ 117 in Coffee County and Drafts and Watercrafts in Franklin County as premier type tourist resorts for purposes of on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, designates The Church @ 117 in Coffee County and Drafts and Watercrafts in Franklin County as premier type tourist resorts for purposes of on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Pub. Ch. 847
2018-05-04 Effective date(s) 04/26/2018
2018-04-26SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-13SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-12SenateConcurred, Ayes 27, Nays 1, PNV 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0867)
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-04-09HousePassed H., Ayes 69, Nays 15, PNV 9
2018-04-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0867)
2018-04-09HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-19HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-15SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 3, PNV 1
2018-03-15SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0699)
2018-03-15SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0698)
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018
2018-03-13SenateSenate Reset on calendar 3/15/18
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018
2018-03-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2358 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback