TN SB2373 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the utility management review board to authorize the private purchase of a utility district; deems such utility district upon sale and transfer of control a public utility for purposes of regulation by the Tennessee public utility commission. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the utility management review board to authorize the private purchase of a utility district; deems such utility district upon sale and transfer of control a public utility for purposes of regulation by the Tennessee public utility commission. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
2018-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
2018-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2140 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback