TN SB2373 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing coverage of telehealth services. - Amends TCA Section 56-7-1002.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing coverage of telehealth services. - Amends TCA Section 56-7-1002.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] |
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 990 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0942) |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0669) |
2016-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0597) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0777) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990