TN SB2369 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an individual, business entity, or government entity to allow the concealed carry of handguns by handgun carry permit holders on the individual's or entity's property while prohibiting other weapons or the open carry of firearms; establishes posting requirements for "concealed firearms by permit only" signage. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.
Title
As enacted, authorizes an individual, business entity, or government entity to allow the concealed carry of handguns by handgun carry permit holders on the individual's or entity's property while prohibiting other weapons or the open carry of firearms; establishes posting requirements for "concealed firearms by permit only" signage. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 4, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 4, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 823 | |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2370 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 823