TN SB2356 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor of person purchasing a used or second-hand firearm if that person is disqualified from purchasing a firearm from a licensed dealer; makes second or subsequent violation a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor of person purchasing a used or second-hand firearm if that person is disqualified from purchasing a firearm from a licensed dealer; makes second or subsequent violation a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
2018-03-29SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 4/3/18
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2302 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback