TN SB2348 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes an obsolete provision that requires a report from the department of labor and workforce development to the commerce and labor committee of the senate and the business and utilities committee of the house of representatives concerning the department's findings and recommendations concerning the Tennessee works pilot program by January 1, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, removes an obsolete provision that requires a report from the department of labor and workforce development to the commerce and labor committee of the senate and the business and utilities committee of the house of representatives concerning the department's findings and recommendations concerning the Tennessee works pilot program by January 1, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Recalled from S. C&L Comm. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2065 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-20 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2348&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2348.pdf |