TN SB2344 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person to obtain a permit to haul waste tires in this state, subject to certain exceptions; applies pre-disposal fee to used tires; makes other additions to law concerning tires. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 14; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 16 and Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 14; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 16 and Title 68, Chapter 211, relative to tires.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2381 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Failed in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee