TN SB2334 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requests the department and its division of health related boards to perform a study on the licensure and regulation of cannabis for medical use by departments of health and medical professional licensing boards in states contiguous to Tennessee and report findings to the general assembly's health committees by December 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requests the department and its division of health related boards to perform a study on the licensure and regulation of cannabis for medical use by departments of health and medical professional licensing boards in states contiguous to Tennessee and report findings to the general assembly's health committees by December 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-03-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020
2020-03-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/4/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2454 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback