TN SB2331 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands from honorably discharged veterans of World War II to all honorably discharged veterans the ability to substitute time in military service for the experience needed to qualify for any position, trade, profession, or vocation. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38; Title 58; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, expands from honorably discharged veterans of World War II to all honorably discharged veterans the ability to substitute time in military service for the experience needed to qualify for any position, trade, profession, or vocation. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38; Title 58; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2493 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee