TN SB2330 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a sentencing court to impose a fine of at least $100 for a person convicted of assault against a domestic abuse victim, subject to the defendant's ability to pay. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a sentencing court to impose a fine of at least $100 for a person convicted of assault against a domestic abuse victim, subject to the defendant's ability to pay. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Pub. Ch. 756
2020-07-02 Effective date(s) 07/01/2020
2020-06-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-06-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-06-18HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-09HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020
2020-02-25SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1982 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 756

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback