TN SB2328 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, until July 1, 2023, that a high school student who completes an early high school graduation program be counted as enrolled in the LEA from which the student graduated for the remainder of the school year in which the student graduated early for purposes of calculating the BEP allocation for the respective LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 3, relative to the basic education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 943 | |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2300 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022