TN SB2326 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, in the case of certain persons who are eligible for restoration of citizenship rights, authorizes the pardoning authority or agent or officer of the supervising or incarcerating authority that issues the certificate of restoration, to forward a copy of the certificate by mail or email to the state coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
As introduced, in the case of certain persons who are eligible for restoration of citizenship rights, authorizes the pardoning authority or agent or officer of the supervising or incarcerating authority that issues the certificate of restoration, to forward a copy of the certificate by mail or email to the state coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2642 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Failed in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee