TN SB2320 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds an advisory question to the November 2018 general election, "Should the Tennessee legislature approve the use of medical marijuana?" - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, adds an advisory question to the November 2018 general election, "Should the Tennessee legislature approve the use of medical marijuana?" - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2391 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee