TN SB2317 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires, when legal notices must be published in a newspaper of general circulation, that the notice also be published on a news and information website that has a URL, if such a website exists, that meets certain requirements. - Amends TCA Title 1 and Title 8, Chapter 44.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 1 and Title 8, Chapter 44, relative to public notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 793
2024-04-08SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024
2024-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2024-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2024
2024-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024
2024-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024
2024-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024
2024-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2024-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2114 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback