TN SB2314 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens the category of nonresident employees, from only teachers to all LEA employees, whose children may attend a school within the LEA that employs the child's parent, including out of state employees of an LEA whose children attend the LEA, and who may be exempt from a tuition requirement, pursuant to board policy. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to attendance requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 709 | |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2086 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 709