TN SB2312 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a local board of education that provides electronic textbooks and instructional materials to provide a student reasonable access to a printed version of an electronic textbook or instructional material if the student or the student's parent or legal guardian submits a written request to the principal of the student's school for a physical or hard copy of the textbook or instructional material. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to instructional materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 752
2024-04-02SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-04-01SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024
2024-03-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024
2024-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2024-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2177 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback