TN SB2307 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a court from requiring an appearance bond for any juvenile released after being taking into custody for a delinquent or unruly act. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a court from requiring an appearance bond for any juvenile released after being taking into custody for a delinquent or unruly act. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 2 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2408 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee