TN SB2297 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises the composition of the state fair board and one of the board's powers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 5-9-102 and Title 43.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises the composition of the state fair board and one of the board's powers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 5-9-102 and Title 43.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 3 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 3 BY SARGENT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1014
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-24SenateConcurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA1284)
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 56, Nays 32, PNV 5
2018-04-23HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1284)
2018-04-23HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA1146)
2018-04-23HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1001)
2018-04-23HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2018-04-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0976)
2018-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-16SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/17/18
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/16/18
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-03-28SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2483 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback