TN SB2290 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits sales and purchases of certain high-capacity, semi-automatic firearms. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 36-3-625; Section 38-3-119; Title 39 and Section 40-14-109.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 54; Section 36-3-625; Section 38-3-119; Title 39 and Section 40-14-109, relative to restricting access to certain firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1935 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Failed for lack of motion in: Criminal Justice Subcommittee