TN SB2285 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that in interpreting a state statute or rule, a court presiding over the appeal of a judgment in a contested case must not defer to a state agency's interpretation of the statute or rule and must interpret the statute or rule de novo; after applying all customary tools of interpretation, the court must resolve any remaining ambiguity against increased agency authority. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 20.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 20, relative to state agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 883 | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed H., Ayes 66, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0805) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0650) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1749 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 883