TN SB2282 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes municipalities to create a fund that provides grants for the study of juveniles involved in prostitution and homicides committed by juveniles. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes municipalities to create a fund that provides grants for the study of juveniles involved in prostitution and homicides committed by juveniles. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2315 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee