TN SB2279 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a public entity from selling, donating, or transferring a historical memorial for purposes of circumventing the waiver requirements or a commission action under the Tennessee heritage protection act; deems such memorials subject to the act upon sale, donation, or transfer to a private party. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-412.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a public entity from selling, donating, or transferring a historical memorial for purposes of circumventing the waiver requirements or a commission action under the Tennessee heritage protection act; deems such memorials subject to the act upon sale, donation, or transfer to a private party. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-412.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2554 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee