TN SB2266 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires for-profit animal crematories to provide receipts to persons who bring animals for cremation at the time that the remains are left and at the time that the remains are picked up; failure to issue the receipts will be a Class E felony; exempts veterinarians from requirement. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 44; Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 68 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, requires for-profit animal crematories to provide receipts to persons who bring animals for cremation at the time that the remains are left and at the time that the remains are picked up; failure to issue the receipts will be a Class E felony; exempts veterinarians from requirement. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 44; Title 62, Chapter 5; Title 68 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 1002 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-17 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1064) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0793) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2206 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002