TN SB2265 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits leaving a handgun in an unattended motor vehicle or boat or a motor vehicle or boat that contains only persons under 18 years of age, if the firearm is not kept from ordinary observation and secured, violation of which is punishable only by fine of $50 or $100 for a second or subsequent offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, prohibits leaving a handgun in an unattended motor vehicle or boat or a motor vehicle or boat that contains only persons under 18 years of age, if the firearm is not kept from ordinary observation and secured, violation of which is punishable only by fine of $50 or $100 for a second or subsequent offense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1713 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.