TN SB2264 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates procedure for licensed establishments to sell and serve products created from combining alcoholic beverages with nonalcoholic products. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, creates procedure for licensed establishments to sell and serve products created from combining alcoholic beverages with nonalcoholic products. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2264&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2264.pdf |