TN SB2253 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, permits the department to toll the mandatory 365 consecutive day period during which certain motor vehicles are required to be equipped with a functioning ignition interlock device if the motor vehicle is inoperable based on specified reasons. - Amends TCA Section 55-10-419(g) and Section 55-10-425.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, permits the department to toll the mandatory 365 consecutive day period during which certain motor vehicles are required to be equipped with a functioning ignition interlock device if the motor vehicle is inoperable based on specified reasons. - Amends TCA Section 55-10-419(g) and Section 55-10-425.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Pub. Ch. 577
2018-03-26 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018; 01/01/2019
2018-03-16SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-03-08SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-05HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-05HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018
2018-02-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1828 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback