TN SB2249 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, updates references in vocational rehabilitation statutes to reflect current nomenclature for the division of rehabilitation services and the director of the vocation rehabilitation program; removes certain requirements concerning services offered by the division of rehabilitation services. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 8.
Title
As enacted, updates references in vocational rehabilitation statutes to reflect current nomenclature for the division of rehabilitation services and the director of the vocation rehabilitation program; removes certain requirements concerning services offered by the division of rehabilitation services. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 720 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1824 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 720