TN SB2244 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes Class I and II off-highway vehicles to be operated on state highways with a posted speed limit of 55 mph or less. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 3; Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 3; Title 55, Chapter 4 and Title 55, Chapter 8, relative to operation of off-highway vehicles on certain roads.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2763 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee