TN SB2244 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Pub. Ch. 516
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Pub. Ch. 516
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the annual renewal of outdoor advertising permits. - Amends TCA Section 54-21-104.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the annual renewal of outdoor advertising permits. - Amends TCA Section 54-21-104.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Pub. Ch. 516 | |
2012-03-02 | Effective date(s) 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-02-14 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-02-14 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-02-13 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-02-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-02-09 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-09 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0645) | |
2012-02-09 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-02-09 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-02-06 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-06 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-06 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0693) | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/6/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 1/31/2012 | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2382 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 516