TN SB2244 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to appoint six, instead of three, responsible citizens of a school district to serve on the school board in instances where the entire board of a special school district is removed for failure of the LEA to meet performance standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of education to appoint six, instead of three, responsible citizens of a school district to serve on the school board in instances where the entire board of a special school district is removed for failure of the LEA to meet performance standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2298 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2244&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2244.pdf |