TN SB2240 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a healthcare provider who is authorized to prescribe buprenorphine under federal law from prescribing via telehealth a buprenorphine product, as approved by the federal food and drug administration for use in recovery or medication-assisted treatment, unless certain conditions met. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the prescribing of buprenorphine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/14/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 881 | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0790) |
2022-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0754) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2335 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 881