TN SB2234 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 855
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 855
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the “Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Compact.” - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As enacted, enacts the “Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Compact.” - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 855 | |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1888 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 855