TN SB2233 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, combines the practices of barbering and cosmetology and the regulation of such practices. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 37-5-212; Section 49-7-2004; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, combines the practices of barbering and cosmetology and the regulation of such practices. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 37-5-212; Section 49-7-2004; Title 62 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1809 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee